SOCIETY OF ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY

Charity number: 249033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion and advancement of the Roman Catholic religion in England & Wales including aid of the upkeep and maintenance of the official residence of the Archbishop of Westminster and the place of meeting of the Catholic Ecclesiastical Authorities in England & Wales

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £55,350
Total expenditure: £65,616

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vincent Thomas Keaveny Chair 19 March 2024
SIR JOHN SOANE'S MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WOOLMEN SUSTAINABILITY START-UP & INNOVATION FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
Veronica Fulton Trustee 28 March 2023
CATHOLIC UNION CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE
Received: On time
ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE
Received: On time
Dr Margaret Ann Burgess DCHS Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Geraldine Marie Therese Kay Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
CLAUDIA MARY JASPER Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
JOHN DICK Trustee 10 May 2018
THE BRITISH HOSPITALITE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMPLEFORTH SOCIETY
Received: On time
CLIONA MARY HOWELL Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £42.75k £34.75k £30.56k £120.03k £55.35k
Total expenditure £59.61k £58.52k £42.53k £57.51k £65.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 26 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 26 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 17 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 25 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 06 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED P.P.R. 24 NOVEMBER 1928
Charitable objects
TO APPLY A SUM NOT EXCEEDING ú600 PER ANNUM IN AUGMENTATION OF THE FUNDS REQUIRED FOR THE PERSONAL USE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF WESTMINSTER FOR THE TIME BEING TO MAINTAIN HIS POSITION AND SUBJECT THERETO TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE SAID FUND FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE ADVANCMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 17 August 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
145B ASHLEY GARDENS
THIRLEBY ROAD
LONDON
SW1P 1HN
Phone:
07903 644 935