Financial history JOSEPH BENTLEY FOR POOR OF FORMER CLASKETGATE WESLEYAN CHAPEL

Charity Number: 249059
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013
Total gross income £29 £1 £1 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A