THE LEICESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of Leicester Diocese are wide but its primary activity is to support the clergy of the Diocese through the payment of stipends, the management and maintenance of parsonages and other ministerial housing and provide other facilities and resources in support of the ministry of both clergy and lay people across the Diocese.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£9,754,000
Donations and legacies | £6.83m | |
Charitable activities | £453.00k | |
Other trading activities | £453.00k | |
Investments | £1.03m | |
Other | £986.00k |
Total expenditure:
£12,571,000
Raising funds | £165.00k | |
Charitable activities | £10.62m | |
Other | £1.79m |
£973,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.95m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.62m |
People

95 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Palmer | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
Ann Margaret Greenwood | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jitesh Krisnakant Patel | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
The Very Reverend Karen Sheila Frances Rooms | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Russell Mark Andrews | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Right Reverend Malayil Lukose Varghese Muthalaly | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephen Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Mark Adshead | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ven Richard Vernon Worsfold | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
THE VENERABLE Claire Wood | Trustee | 08 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
RT REVD MARTYN JAMES SNOW | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||||
Christopher John Sheldon | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.14m | £9.64m | £10.90m | £10.96m | £10.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.56m | £12.10m | £11.86m | £12.01m | £12.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £379.00k | £149.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.51m | £6.95m | £7.67m | £7.21m | £6.83m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.25m | £468.00k | £746.00k | £1.34m | £453.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £457.00k | £1.09m | £682.00k | £556.00k | £453.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £798.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.16m | £958.00k | £978.00k | £950.00k | £1.03m | |
|
Income - Other | £1.76m | £173.00k | £823.00k | £902.00k | £986.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.91m | £10.62m | £10.57m | £10.34m | £10.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £208.00k | £257.00k | £190.00k | £201.00k | £165.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £158.00k | £155.00k | £113.00k | £178.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £302.00k | £0 | £0 | £364.00k | £765.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £208.00k | £257.00k | £28.00k | £21.00k | £165.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £439.00k | £1.23m | £1.10m | £1.47m | £1.79m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £40.00m | £39.37m | £38.64m | £38.29m | £34.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £41.38m | £40.63m | £41.37m | £43.75m | £43.75m | |
|
Other assets | £2.77m | £2.00m | £2.70m | £2.50m | £5.15m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£668.00k | -£190.00k | -£27.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.00m | £5.16m | £3.62m | £4.00m | £3.76m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JANUARY 1928. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 MAY 2024 as amended on 10 Jul 2024 as amended on 19 Jul 2024 as amended on 23 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
The Objects for which the DBF is established are: To promote, aid, and further the objects and work of the Church of England as at present constituted or as hereafter it may be constituted, and more particularly in the Diocese of Leicester (hereinafter called ?the Diocese?) for that purpose to do and carry out or assist in doing or carrying out all such matters and things as are likely to promote or help any of the said objects or work, and in particular to assist by grants, subscriptions, or payments of money or otherwise all or any of the following departments of work: - Training for the ministry and work of such Church. - Maintenance of the clergy and other persons connected with the ministry and work of such Church. - Provisions of pensions for and the support, assistance, and benefit of ministers, teachers, and workers of such Church, and of persons who have previously held any such positions, and, where such persons are deceased, their surviving partners, spouses, descendants and dependents. - Purchase, improvement and repair of houses for such clergy and other persons connected with the ministry and work of such Church. - The provision of sites for and the erection, purchase, equipment, endowment, maintenance, insurance, enlargement, alteration, and repair of churches, chapels, churchyards, burial grounds, and of buildings of all kinds, with or without gardens, or other grounds, used or to be used for the purposes of or in connection with any work of such Church. - Education of the young, and in particular their religious education. - Provision for the Cathedral. - The expenses of any organisation or work carried on wholly or partially by the DBF or by the Central Board of Finances for the Church of England. With such additions to the departments aforesaid as from time to time may be expedient for the furthering of the work and influence of such Church. To promote, aid, and further (in such matter as may be approved and sanctioned by the Bishop for the time being) the objects and work of any mission, church, or body of Christians in communion with the Church of England in any part of the world.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LEICESTER
Linked charities
- 03 April 1991 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Peacock Lane
Leicester
LE1 5PZ
- Phone:
- 01162625326
- Email:
- jonathan.kerry@leccofe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window