BERNARD KAHN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and the advancement of education and religion within the Jewish community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 06 September 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mirjam Kahn | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
YAACOV ZVI KAHN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.53k | £74.46k | £70.33k | £92.34k | £103.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.07k | £80.73k | £66.11k | £89.13k | £99.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 APRIL 1965.
Charitable objects
TRUST FUND FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES. THE TRUSTEES SHALL ENTIRELY WITHIN THEIR OWN DISCRETION APPLY ALL OR ANY PART OF THE INCOME RECEIVED BY THEM IN ANY YEAR FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE JEWISH COMMUNITY: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY GENERALLY AND IN PAYMENT TO NEEDY INDIVIDUALS. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 ELMCROFT AVENUE
LONDON
NW11 0RR
- Phone:
- 07973178975
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window