CHARITY OF STEPHEN BLAIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of annual donations : for maintenance of Bolton Parish Church; Organist at Bolton Parish Church; Choir at Bolton Parish Church;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Bolton
Governance
- 23 September 1966: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
EVELYN FRANCES WESTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 25 APRIL 1958
Charitable objects
1. $5 YEARLY TO THE ORGANIST OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. JOHN BOLTON. 2. $5 YEARLY FOR THE CHOIR OF THE SAID CHURCH. 3. $5 TO BE BANKED OR INVESTED AS A RESERVE FUND FOR THE PURPOSES OF REPAIRS TO THE SAID CHURCH. 4. REMAINING INCOME TO BE APPLIED EITHER IN THE SUPPLY OF ARTICLES IN KIND OR IN GRANTS OF MONEY TO POOR PERSONS, MEN OR WOMEN (WITH A PREFERENCE FOR POOR AGED PERSONS AND FOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF ST. JOHN, BOLTON) WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION ATTENDING THE SAID CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. JOHN BOLTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 FOREST ROAD
BOLTON
BL1 6LT
- Phone:
- 01204840633
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window