JOHN YATES CHARITY
Charity number: 249194
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- North Yorkshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 September 1966: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GIFT IN 1861 (U.V. 35 P. 241)
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURCHASE OF BLANKETS TO BE GIVEN AT CHRISTMAS YEARLY BY THE RECTOR OF RYTHER FOR THE TIME BEING, TO SUCH POOR PERSONS LIVING IN THE PARISH OF RYTHER AS HE SHOULD THINK MOST DESERVING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF RYTHER
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window