LLANERFYL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE VILLAGE HALL IS AVAILABLE TO HIRE FOR ACTIVITIES. CURRENT ACTIVITIES INCLUDE YOGA, PLAYGROUP, REHEARSALS, CONCERTS, SCHOOL SESSIONS, BIRTHDAY PARTIES, MEETINGS, TRAINING AND FUNDRAISING EVENTS. IT IS ALSO USED FOR FUNERAL TEAS AND WEDDING RECEPTION/PARTIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 24 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tegryd Rees | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd James | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.39k | £25.45k | £7.84k | £17.77k | £21.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | £8.40k | £11.55k | £17.88k | £10.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN P.R. 19 MARCH 1910
Charitable objects
MEETINGS OF THE PARISH AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE MANAGEMENT THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
LLANERFYL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caerffynnon
Llanerfyl
WELSHPOOL
Powys
SY21 0EG
- Phone:
- 07887802792
- Email:
- lesleyb200@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window