Trustees THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 249295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROY SMITH MBE Chair 09 April 2014
None on record
Varun Yadav Trustee 01 March 2024
THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Joanna Turnbull Trustee 29 January 2024
THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Alan Turnbull Trustee 29 January 2024
THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
Olam Melchi Ray-Imanuel Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Mr D Robson Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
Mrs J Westlake Trustee 18 July 2018
THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
BRIAN GAFF Trustee
THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered
GEORGE PHILLIPS Trustee
THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Recently registered