Accounts and annual returns THE ARTS AND CRAFTS LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 249300
Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 29 October 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 17 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required