Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS TO THE ROBERT JONES & AGNES HUNT ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL
Charity Number: 249346

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gareth Evan David | Chair | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Guy Phillip Chambers | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack William Fallows | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Warren | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ERICA MOSS | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Janet Greasley | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Dixon | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Lindsay RUTHERFORD | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Ian Sawers | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Lillis | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ralison | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Celia Jenkins | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Spencer-Jones | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE RT HON LADY SUSAN TREVOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.