Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTE OF WOOD PRESERVING AND DAMP-PROOFING

Charity Number: 249370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 10 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 17 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 12 December 2007 42 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 22 November 2006 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 28 July 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 28 July 2005 On Time