Governing document THE INSTITUTE OF WOOD PRESERVING AND DAMP-PROOFING
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 04 JUNE 1930 AS AMENDED 2ND MAY 1951 AS AMENDED 13TH DECEMBER 1979, 20TH JULY 1989, AND 29TH DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO INVESTIGATE AND DISCOVER AND TO ACQUIRE, COLLECT, PROMOTE AND SPREAD THE KNOWLEDGE OF ALL KINDS OF METHODS OF PRESERVING WOOD, WHETHER BY TREATMENT OR OTHERWISE, OF FIRE-PROOFING, AND OF PREVENTING WASTAGE OF TIMBER AND OF DAMP-PROOFING BUILDINGS, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE STANDARDISATION OF SPECIFICATIONS FOR WOOD PRESERVATIVES AND THE APPLICATION THERE OF AND TO PROMOTE THE USE OF TREATED WOOD GENERALLY AND THE DAMP-PROOFING OF BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.