THE CENTRAL DEACONESS HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 20 October 1967: Standard registration
- 12 August 2002: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 August 2002: Funds transferred to 1093320 THE WOMEN'S CONTINUING MINISTERIAL EDUCATION TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 3RD MARCH 1927, DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD JUNE 1929, CONVEYANCE DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1945, COMMISSIONERS' SCHEMES OF 31ST OCTOBER 1962 AND 7TH DECEMBER 1972 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH MARCH 1984.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE SPIRITUAL MORAL INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL WELL-BEING OF DEACONESSES THROUGHOUTH THE ANGLICAL COMMUNION AND FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR WORK AND INFLUENCE AND FOR THE OFFERING OF PRAYERS FOR THE WHOLE ORDER OF DEACONESSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.