THE A M G AND A N M TRUST
Charity number: 249428
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes donations to organisations and trusted individuals who can help our aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2008
Total income: £1,258
Total expenditure: £665
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Burma
- India
- Indonesia
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 September 1966: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- APRIL TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £984 | £1.03k | £1.11k | £1.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236 | £1.00k | £450 | £665 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 25 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 16TH MARCH 1966.
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNRESTRICTED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window