Accounts and annual returns BEN PEEL WATSON TRUST

Charity number: 249471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 November 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2022 05 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2019 11 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2019 Not Required