Financial history BEN PEEL WATSON TRUST

Charity Number: 249471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/11/2019 05/11/2020 05/11/2021 05/11/2022 05/11/2023
Total gross income £562 £639 £467 £568 £588
Total expenditure £559 £647 £441 £588 £568
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A