THE POLISH EX-COMBATANTS ASSOCIATION IN GREAT BRITAIN TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, education/training, relief of poverty. Help to people of a particular ethnic. Makes grants to individuals Makes grants to organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1966: Standard registration
- FUNDACJA STOWARZYSZENIA POLSKICH KOMBATANTOW W WIELKIEJ BRITANII (Working name)
- THE POLISH EX-COMBATANTS' ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zofia Marchewka | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Celina Kumorek | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
STANISLAW SAMEK | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|||||
EUGENIUSZ NEAD NIEDZIELSKI | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACEK BERNASINSKI | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KRZYSZTOF DE BERG | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS TERESA SZADKOWSKA LAKOMY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ZOFIA ORLOWSKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAREK STRACZYNSKI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £1.02k | £261 | £7.43k | £38.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.10k | £130.66k | £156.33k | £77.90k | £115.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1957 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 5 MAY 1965 AND RESOLUTIONS MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF POLES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS DEED "POLES" SHALL MEAN INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OF HAVE BEEN AT ANY TIME BEEN POLISH CITIZENS OR THE DESCENDANTS OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS OR THE SPOUSES CHILD OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS OR DESCENDANTS.
Area of benefit
WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
240 KING STREET
LONDON
W6 0RF
- Phone:
- 02087411911
- Email:
- fundacja@spk-wb.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window