THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF MARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal charitable aims of the charity were to support the religious and other charitable works of the members of the Institute and to care for them throughout their lives. The activities of the charity fall into three main areas: the social and pastoral work of the sisters, caring for members of the Institute, and running the Retreat and Conference Centre in Cold Ash, Berkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Algeria
- Ireland
- Italy
- Malta
- Pakistan
- Poland
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Syria
- United States
Governance
- 12 December 1966: Standard registration
- 21 March 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1199658 FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF MARY UK CIO
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72m | £5.04m | £5.93m | £3.46m | £100.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70m | £3.42m | £5.87m | £2.30m | £117.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £770.27k | £2.89m | £2.91m | £2.62m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £135.98k | £46.79k | £3.52k | £47.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £715.27k | £644.90k | £689.75k | £755.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £93.67k | £1.46m | £2.33m | £29.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £40.24k | £128.18k | £0 | £73.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.68m | £3.40m | £5.86m | £2.29m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £17.92k | £17.49k | £6.91k | £12.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.54k | £28.82k | £28.62k | £100.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £846.49k | £1.60m | £1.66m | £495.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £4.55k | £3.82k | £6.91k | £9.74k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SOCIETY KNOWN AS THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF MARY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window