THE ROYAL ISLE OF WIGHT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds annual Agricultural Show and several fund raising events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 27 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cindy Mary Betley | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANN EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL HORNE | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILLIAN ELIZABETH KENNETT | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDI GRIFFIN | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HEATHER | Trustee | 06 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Biss | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|||||
SHARON FIONA GROVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER MALCOLM BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MICHAEL GROVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN SEYMOUR RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.54k | £37.85k | £63.89k | £179.32k | £167.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.76k | £32.75k | £63.77k | £136.96k | £142.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE SOCIETY (REVISED 17TH DECEMBER 1955) AND ORDER OF 19 MAY 2004 AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 4 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY A CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 04/12/2014
Charitable objects
1) WITHIN THE ISLE OF WIGHT TO ENCOURAGE AGRICULTURE GENERALLY AND THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND IN PARTICULAR AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING, KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS-PUBLICATIONS, FUNDING, MEETINGS AND SEMINARS (HOSTED BY APPROPRIATELY QUALIFIED INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS), ORGANISING DISPLAYS, PROMOTIONAL EVENTS AND THE COUNTY SHOW. 2) TO ASSIST PEOPLE IN FURTHERING THEIR EDUCATION IN THEIR TRADES, VOCATIONS AND PROFESSIONS LINKED TO AGRICULTURE AND THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT VIA RECOGNISED TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS OR INDIVIDUALS BY BURSARIES, GRANTS AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL ISLE OF WIGHT
AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
SHIDE MEADOWS CENTRE
SHIDE ROAD
NEWPORT
PO30 1HR
- Phone:
- 0845 226 9098
- Website:
-
riwas.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window