Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AND PRIORY GERRARDS CROSS ADMINISTERED IN CONNEXION WITH THE ORDER OF DISCALCED CARMELITES

Charity Number: 249602
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 March 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 March 2024 49 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 June 2022 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 June 2022 126 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time