ST JOSEPH'S ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AND PRIORY GERRARDS CROSS ADMINISTERED IN CONNEXION WITH THE ORDER OF DISCALCED CARMELITES
Charity number: 249602
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income: £114,956
Total expenditure: £116,127
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 27 October 1966: Standard registration
- 11 February 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1200259 DISCALCED CARMELITES UK CIO
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- ST JOSEPH'S PRIORY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.70k | £80.33k | £85.24k | £78.30k | £114.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.71k | £71.20k | £81.48k | £71.43k | £116.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 126 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time |
Submit annual return
Open in new window
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1913.
Charitable objects
A ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH TO SERVE THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND OTHER ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF CHALFONT ST. PETER
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window