THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity Number: 249678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Resourcing the Ministry and Mission in every parish Managing the number of clergy in post against budget, and collecting Fairer Shares contributions Providing clergy training, housing, stipends, pension supporting parish based ministry Contributing to national church institutions Providing education & social outreach funding Providing Diocesan Retreat House

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Surrey
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

33 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Anthony Williams OBE Trustee 05 December 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW CROYDON
Received: On time
The Venerable Dr Chigor Chike Trustee 05 December 2024
RIGHTS AND EQUALITIES IN NEWHAM
Received: On time
SARUM COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE UNITED SOCIETY
Received: On time
THAMESMEAD CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Anne Yvonne Bennett Trustee 05 December 2024
WASH HOUSE YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time
Thomas Marshall Manson Trustee 05 December 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CATHERINE'S, HATCHAM
Received: On time
Rev Antonio Garcia Fuerte Trustee 05 December 2024
ALL SAINTS WITH SAINT MARGARET, UPPER NORWOOD
Received: On time
Grahame Elliott Woods Trustee 05 December 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALFEGE, GREENWICH
Received: On time
The Revd Dr Charles John Mackinnon Bell Trustee 05 December 2024
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
TOGETHER FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Recently registered
James William Murdoch Trustee 05 December 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOOD SHEPHERD WITH ST. PETER, LEE
Received: On time
The Revd Capt Nicholas Kwabena Lebey Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Paul Martin Waddell Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Rev Nicholas James Peacock Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Rev Jonathan Niall Agnew MacNeaney Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
His Honour Nigel John Seed KC Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Rev Bridget Clare Shepherd Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Rt Revd Jonathan Martin Gainsborough Trustee 02 February 2023
ST AUGUSTINE'S COLLEGE OF THEOLOGY LTD
Received: On time
Sarah Frances Docx Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
Rev Edward Fraser A Scrase-Field Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Jonathan Maurice Sedgwick Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Joseph Ahosu Goswell Trustee 29 November 2019
GOOD SHEPHERD MISSION HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
David Richard Beamish Trustee 18 December 2018
HANSARD SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DULWICH, ST BARNABAS
Received: On time
Vasantha Gnanadoss Trustee 18 December 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTERSEA FIELDS
Received: On time
Rebecca Justine Chapman Trustee 18 December 2018
THE CHURCH AND MEDIA NETWORK
Received: On time
TRINITY COLLEGE BRISTOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Solabomi Anike Ogun Trustee 18 December 2018
None on record
Rev Gregory Stephen Prior Trustee 05 December 2018
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP IN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN WELCARE
Received: On time
Alan George Saunders Trustee 01 July 2018
RICHMOND CHURCH CHARITY ESTATES
Received: On time
The Venerable Moira Anne Elizabeth Astin Trustee 30 October 2016
COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Received: 199 days late
REGINALD BAKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Marlene Rosemarie Mallett Trustee 28 November 2015
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
TOGETHER SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
Adrian Greenwood Trustee 28 November 2015
THE INASMUCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. JAMES WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND ST. CRISPIN, BERMONDSEY
Received: On time
LINK AGE SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
Dr NICHOLAS JOHN BURT Trustee 28 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES WEST STREATHAM SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
FURZEDOWN CHURCHES LTD
Received: On time
Ven John Kiddle Trustee 28 November 2015
None on record
The Venerable SIMON PHILIP GATES Trustee 04 September 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET THE QUEEN, STREATHAM HILL
Received: On time
Rt Revd Alastair Murray Cutting Trustee 15 May 2013
ACG LIMITED
Received: 56 days late
FULCRUM-ANGLICAN
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Christopher Thomas James Chessun Trustee 27 September 2011
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND
Received: 4 days late
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
SOCIETY OF SAINT FRANCIS CENTRAL FUND
Received: On time
THE NIKAEAN ECUMENICAL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.60m £25.28m £29.01m £26.12m £23.81m
Total expenditure £20.71m £23.90m £24.38m £25.91m £26.77m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.17m £20.61m £21.10m £19.72m £19.97m
Income - Other trading activities £148.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.10m £2.28m £2.46m £2.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £853.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.36m £1.90m £1.13m £1.24m £1.27m
Income - Other £1.57m £1.68m £4.51m £2.71m £435.00k
Income - Legacies £76.26k £38.00k £128.00k £0 £8.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.69m £23.88m £24.38m £25.68m £26.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.25k £24.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £96.35k £95.00k £122.00k £159.00k £128.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.47m £2.52m £2.51m £1.74m £2.63m
Expenditure - Investment management £24.25k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £224.00k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £269.38m £269.28m £276.26m £275.60m £291.04m
Long-term investments £29.17m £24.32m £27.30m £25.07m £25.37k
Other assets £2.64m £4.99m £8.46m £9.90m £4.59m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.15m £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £8.04m £9.46m £5.60m £4.45m £5.74m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TRINITY HOUSE
4 CHAPEL COURT
BOROUGH HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE1 1HW
Phone:
020 7939 9400