THE MOTHERS' UNION (SALISBURY DIOCESE BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We reach out to families by organising parenting groups, parent & toddler groups and marriage preparation resources, family holidays, support for families at our local prisons and women's refuges and a commitment to uphold members around the world in our prayers. Since September 2010 we have employed, with the help of grants, a Community Development Co-ordinator to facilitate this work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Gamble | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GOATER | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jocelyn Patricia Short | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ann Walsh | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Higgs | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS R ALLEN | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MARGARET OAKES | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BOWLER | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARLENE HAFFENDEN | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.87k | £36.41k | £54.44k | £47.98k | £69.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.53k | £43.18k | £51.28k | £47.53k | £64.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 21/10/1975
Charitable objects
1.TO UPHOLD CHRISTS TEACHINGS ON THE NATURE OF MARRIAGE AND TO PROMOTE ITS WIDER UNDERSTANDING. 2.TO ENCOURAGE PARENTS TO BRING UP THEIR CHILDERN IN THE FAITH AND LIFE OF THE CHURCH.3.TO MAINTAIN WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTAINS, UNITED IN PRAYER,WORSHIP AND SERVICE. 4.TO PROMOTE CONDITIONS IN SOCIETY FAVOURABLE TO A STABLE FAMILY LIFE AND FOR THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN. 5.TO HELP THOSE WHOSE FAMILY HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY.
Area of benefit
THE DIOCESE OF SALISBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. THOMAS'S HOUSE
ST. THOMAS'S SQUARE
SALISBURY
SP1 1BA
- Phone:
- 01722333402
- Email:
- mothers.union@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window