THE MOTHERS' UNION (LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the work of the Mothers Union worldwide, but operates mainly with the Diocese of Liverpool, providing support to families, children, young people and older people within the area. Operating within the community, schools, hospitals and prisons to support those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cheshire East
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
- 06 December 1966: Standard registration
- THE MOTHERS UNION (LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN BRANCH) (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS CAROLINE COLLINS | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Sharp | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Miller | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Boden | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Gladders | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Harper | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
BRENDA KINVIG | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.40k | £45.93k | £54.20k | £54.21k | £147.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.96k | £36.68k | £50.25k | £49.91k | £60.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 21/10/1975
Charitable objects
1) TO UPHOLD CHRIST'S TEACHING ON THE NATURE OF MARRIAGE AND TO PROMOTE ITS WIDER UNDERSTANDING. 2) TO ENCOURAGE PARENTS TO BRING UP THEIR CHILDREN IN THE FAITH AND LIFE OF THE CHURCH. 3) TO MAINTAIN A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIANS UNITED IN PRAYER, WORSHIP AND SERVICE. 4) TO PROMOTE CONDITIONS IN SOCIETY FAVOURABLE TO FAMILY LIFE AND THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN. 5) TO HELP THOSE WHOSE FAMILY LIFE HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST JAMES'HOUSE
20 ST. JAMES ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L1 7BY
- Phone:
- 01517052110
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window