THE LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development and implementation of mission and church growth strategies. The provision of advisory services to bishops, parishes, schools and church bodies (mainly through employed staff). The support, training, payment and housing of clergy. The support and training of lay people. The management and development of staff members. Contributing to the national work of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£14,276,193
Donations and legacies | £13.33m | |
Charitable activities | £245.85k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £688.19k | |
Other | £11.00k |
Total expenditure:
£14,301,235
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £14.04m | |
Other | £260.53k |
£294,878 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £260.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £14.04m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £260.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £14.04m | |
Retained for future use | £269.84k |
People

74 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
- 14 November 1966: Standard registration
- 13 October 2022: Funds received from 1180224 TRANSFORM NORTHWEST NETWORK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Emma Louise Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Miranda Threlfall-Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Richard Denno | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Canon Margaret Anne Swinson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Gabriel Kai Yin Chiu | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Philip Derringer | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Peter Dawkin | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Venerable Simon Fisher | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Keith William Cawdron | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rt Rev Beverley Mason | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Stott | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Matthewson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
Venerable Peter Hendry Spiers | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.15m | £15.12m | £15.00m | £15.39m | £14.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.27m | £13.62m | £14.57m | £14.73m | £14.30m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £175.44k | £32.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.02m | £13.78m | £13.53m | £13.15m | £13.33m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £398.35k | £480.75k | £355.32k | £460.99k | £245.85k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £643.33k | £600.11k | £646.79k | £682.30k | £688.19k | |
|
Income - Other | £80.76k | £260.64k | £451.57k | £1.10m | £11.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.27m | £13.28m | £14.37m | £14.51m | £14.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £202.73k | £321.19k | £0 | £212.52k | £260.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £606.71k | £311.26k | £376.57k | £996.29k | £1.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.75k | £344.44k | £207.30k | £212.52k | £260.53k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £40.27m | £39.99m | £39.90m | £39.03m | £38.85m | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.51m | £9.78m | £10.35m | £9.81m | £10.10m | |
|
Other assets | £1.47m | £3.74m | £3.79m | £5.08m | £5.14m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£666.00k | -£322.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.56m | £5.43m | £5.28m | £5.04m | £4.94m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MAY 1883 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND TO ACT AS THE ADMINISTRATIVE UNIT OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St James' House
20 St James Road
Liverpool
L1 7BY
- Phone:
- 01517099722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window