Accounts and annual returns KING'S LYNN AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 249750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 February 2006 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 04 May 2005 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 04 May 2005 93 days late