THE MOTHERS' UNION OF THE DIOCESE OF RIPON AND LEEDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian care for families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 December 1966: Standard registration
- 29 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1164024 MOTHERS' UNION, DIOCESE OF LEEDS
- M U (Working name)
- THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF RIPON) BRANCH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.94k | £62.77k | £59.25k | £63.98k | £56.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.57k | £62.83k | £57.91k | £60.23k | £66.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 11 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 11 March 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 19 May 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 10 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 10 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 08 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 08 June 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 1926
Charitable objects
1. TO UPHOLD THE SANCTITY OF MARRIAGE. 2. TO AWAKEN IN ALL MOTHERS A SENSE OF THEIR GREAT RESPONSIBILITY IN THE TRAINING OF THEIR BOYS AND GIRLS - THE FATHERS AND MOTHERS OF THE FUTURE. 3. TO ORGANISE IN EVERY PLACE A BAND OF MOTHERS WHO WILL UNITE IN PRAYER, AND SEEK BY THEIR OWN EXAMPLE TO LEAD THEIR FAMILIES IN PURITY AND HOLINESS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF RIPON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window