THATCHAM PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of hall for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 09 November 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY CHARLES GEORGE BROOKS | Chair | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON EVERETT PIKE | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY COTTAM | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Petra Pemberton | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ramon Beeks | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Brown | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE TAYLOR | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.08k | £5.29k | £23.67k | £17.74k | £11.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £5.02k | £9.26k | £12.18k | £29.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.40k | £2.73k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/05/2014
Charitable objects
IMPROVING THE CONDIDTIONS OF LIFE BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THATCHAM.
Area of benefit
THATCHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel Street
THATCHAM
Berkshire
RG18 4JP
- Phone:
- 07869 105 425
- Email:
- TREASURER.TPH@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window