Financial history MOTHERS' UNION SOUTHWELL & NOTTINGHAM DIOCESE

Charity Number: 249878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £69.10k £52.25k £44.76k £48.27k £35.85k
Total expenditure £68.34k £50.82k £50.23k £48.41k £42.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k N/A £700