Financial history THE UNION OF CATHOLIC MOTHERS

Charity Number: 249901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £89.39k £54.63k £41.55k £44.67k £89.64k
Total expenditure £73.97k £24.64k £38.26k £96.97k £95.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A