TRUSTEES OF THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Charity aims to provide (a) a place of worship for Orthodox Christians who are predominantly members of the Greek Orthodox Archdiocese of Great Britain, (b) educational opportunities for the community we serve (of Greeks and Greek Cypriots who are first, second, or even sometimes third generation immigrants), (c) social, welfare and cultural activities, and (d) an information centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of York
- Cumbria
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 November 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Konstantinos Karakousis | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
COSTAS TSAKIRIDES | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOS HADJICHARITOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREAS CHRISTOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES KYRIACOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Barry Paschali | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.84k | £124.16k | £121.46k | £147.30k | £161.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.63k | £109.35k | £98.25k | £121.35k | £148.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 15 December 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 17 December 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 10TH OCTOBER 1966.
Charitable objects
DONATIONS TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS. AQUIRING PLACES OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND BURIAL GROUNDS. RELIGIOUS EDUCATION. PROVIDING PRIESTS STIPENDS RELIGIOUS TEACHERS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED
Area of benefit
WITHIN 20 MILES OF THE GENERAL POST OFFICE, LEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH
57 HAREHILLS AVENUE
LEEDS
LS8 4EU
- Phone:
- 0113 249 0814
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window