CECIL PILKINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 249997
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The capital and income of the Trust shall be applied to such charitable corporations, trusts, associations, or institutions for charitable purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall decide and for the preservation of trust land and buildings for the benefit of the nation or the inhabitants for the time being.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 October 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Vanessa Pilkington Trustee 20 April 2012
PILOZZO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HELOISE PILKINGTON Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record
MARK RUPERT FEENY Trustee
THE ARTHUR KAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RIMMER MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CASTANEA TRUST
Received: On time
NML FOUNDATION
Received: On time
EARLY MUSIC AS EDUCATION
Received: On time
THE VIRGINIE KEULEYAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ARNOLD PHILIP PILKINGTON Trustee
PILKINGTON CHARITIES FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
THE GENERAL CHARITY FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/10/2019 05/10/2020 05/10/2021 05/10/2022 05/10/2023
Total gross income £341.39k £325.56k £437.95k £466.59k £521.97k
Total expenditure £431.13k £413.90k £561.44k £642.65k £807.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.44k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £429.14k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.39k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £703.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £104.21k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £642.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £104.21k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £12

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/10/2019 05/10/2020 05/10/2021 05/10/2022 05/10/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.54m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.72m
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.59m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.40k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 October 2023 29 October 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2023 29 October 2024 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2022 15 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2020 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2020 04 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 October 2019 05 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2019 05 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DUNCAN SHEARD GLASS
CASTLE CHAMBERS
43 CASTLE STREET
LIVERPOOL
L2 9TL
Phone:
0151 294 5400
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available