HALLIWICK ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING THERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes all aspects of swimming for people with disabilities. It uses The Halliwick Concept.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 1966: Standard registration
- 13 April 2016: Funds received from 261626 KENSINGTON EMPERORS SWIMMING CLUB
- HALLIWICK AST (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING THERAPY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM WYATT MBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Dawn Moore | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicole Lawson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martyn Saville | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Davis | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Wood SRN SCM | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BENTLEY | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Alison Teasdale Skinner FCSP BA | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
E DILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.99k | £10.69k | £6.82k | £14.71k | £15.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.21k | £14.57k | £14.82k | £12.76k | £15.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED 2ND APRIL 1966,4TH MARCH 1990, 6 MARCH 1994 AND 2 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND TEACH SWIMMING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. (B) TO FURTHER THE INSTRUCTION OF, AND TEACHING BY, THE SPECIALISED METHOD KNOWN AS THE HALLIWICK CONCEPT (C) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN BY EDUCATION AND EXAMINATION A PROPER STANDARD OF INSTRUCTION. (D) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC OPINION TOWARDS PROVIDING PROPER FACILITIES AND ACCOMMODATION FOR TEACHING AND PRACTISING SWIMMING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. (E) TO DRAW UP, PUBLISH AND ENFORCE UNIFORM REGULATIONS FOR THE CONTROL AND ADMINISTRATION OF SWIMMING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. (G) TO PROMOTE SWIMMING COMPETITIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AMONGST CLUBS, REGIONS AND NATIONS. (G) TO ADJUDICATE ON SUCH COMPETITIONS AND TO DEAL WITH INFRINGEMENTS OF ANY REGULATIONS THAT MAY APPLY TO SUCH COMPETITIONS (H) TO COLLECT ANALYSE AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION OF VALUE THAT MAY BE ACQUIRED BY, OR ARISE FROM THE WORK OF THE ASSOCIATION I) TO WORK CLOSELY WITH, AND AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME, TO AFFILIATE TO AND PAY DUE SUBSCRIPTIONS TO ANY OTHER NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL BODY TO PROMOTE SWIMMING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES USING THE HALLIWICK CONCEPT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Halliwick AST C/o Hollycrofts
Walnut Tree Lane
Loose
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME15 9RQ
- Phone:
- 07817 789 837
- Email:
- halliwickast.chair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window