THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BURNHAM-ON-SEA WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide funds to cover improvements to Burnham On Sea hospital for the benefit of patients and staff or to purchase equipment for use at the hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 January 1963: Standard registration
- 14 May 2013: Funds received from 294913 COMMUNITY MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FUND
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceri Joyce | Chair | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Vowles | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Susan Hamilton | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Hamilton | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Dyer | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gilbert Hambleton | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Eileen Shaw | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JON COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.69k | £11.88k | £21.61k | £28.06k | £20.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.11k | £19.69k | £14.92k | £30.27k | £27.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE LEAGUE, AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 1997 AND 8 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC OF BUMHAM-ON-SEA, HIGHBRIDGE AND DISTRICT IN THE HOSPITAL, THE WELFARE OF THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. 3.2 TO MAINTAIN GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN THE FRIENDS, THE MANAGEMENT OF THE HOSPITAL AND THE MANAGEMENT OF THE SOMERSET PRIMARY CARE TRUST. 3.3 TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND MANAGE SUCH FUNDS AS ARE AVAILABLE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPLEMENTING THE RESOURCES OF THE HOSPITAL, IN CONJUNCTION WITH ADVICE AND CONSULTATION WITH HOSPITAL MANAGERS. 3.4 TO ASSIST IN THE RECRUITMENT OF VOLUNTARY WORKERS IN AND FOR THE HOSPITAL. 3.5 TO PROVIDE A LINK BETWEEN THE HOSPITAL AND THE COMMUNITY IT SERVES. 3.6 TO OBTAIN THE CO-OPERATION OF OTHER BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE HOSPITAL. 3.7 TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
BURNHAM-ON-SEA, HIGHRIDGE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Royal Sands
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Avon
BS23 4NH
- Phone:
- 07946886653
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window