THE EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 250068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Acts as Holding Trustee for Baptist Churches in the East Midlands, approves modifications to buildings, makes grants and loans enabling work to be carried out.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £65,064
Total expenditure: £40,564

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 May 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Charles Harvey Trustee 01 November 2024
EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Andrew David Smallridge Trustee 10 October 2024
EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
WILLIAM AND MARY HART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MELTON MOWBRAY BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Dr Christopher Douglas Hanning Trustee 23 January 2020
WHETSTONE BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Gary Niven Anderson Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
Rev MARK CLAY Trustee 10 October 2016
ST HILD CENTRE FOR BAPTIST MINISTRY
Recently registered
EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE EAST MIDLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
WILLIAM AND MARY HART FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £68.45k £42.46k £25.51k £33.87k £65.06k
Total expenditure £51.61k £34.42k £38.41k £28.26k £40.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JANUARY 2004 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER SECTION 96(5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 26 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
1 THE PAYMENT OF OR CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE PURCHASE AND ACQUISITION OF LAND EITHER WITH OR WITHOUT BUILDINGS THEREOF AS SITES FOR CHURCHES SUCH LAND TO BE SETTLED UPON CHARITABLE TRUSTS 2 FOR OR TOWARDS THE REPAYMENT OF MONIES BORROWED BY A CHURCH AND EXPENDED FOR THE PURPOSE SPECIFIED IN CLAUSE 1
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 26 May 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
EMBA Office
C/o West Bridgford Baptist Church
Melton Road
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
Phone:
07763 401 793