Accounts and annual returns MOUNTAIN ASH YMCA

Charity number: 250106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2025 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 June 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 July 2022 173 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 June 2022 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required