Financial history MOUNTAIN ASH YMCA

Charity number: 250106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.75k £26.95k £12.90k £13.32k £32.17k
Total expenditure £22.52k £23.10k £16.92k £12.61k £28.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £1.52k N/A £15.97k