Financial history WARRINGTON YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 250114
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £299.18k £297.91k £245.10k £185.45k £188.92k
Total expenditure £309.34k £298.94k £242.62k £212.24k £385.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £171.81k £92.94k £84.14k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.20k £0 £0