Accounts and annual returns LAUGHARNE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 250144
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 22 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 09 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required