Chipperfield Village Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Chipperfield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 29 November 1966: Standard registration
- CHIPPERFIELD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- CHIPPERFIELD CHURCH INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Kendrick Bush | Chair | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Baumal | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Thornton | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
HUGH CLIFFORD | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.78k | £29.78k | £29.15k | £18.38k | £29.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.12k | £14.29k | £14.23k | £22.00k | £32.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £500 | £500 | £500 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75k | £23.56k | £10.25k | £1.10k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 25 FEBRUARY 1982. as amended on 08 Jul 2020 as amended on 05 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIPPERFIELD.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIPPERFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chipperfield Village Hall
The Common
Chipperfield
Kings Langley
WD4 9BS
- Phone:
- 01923269270
- Email:
- cj.saunders@me.com
- Website:
-
chipperfieldvillagehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window