NAVAL BASE DEVONPORT AREA FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting in the area of Plymouth Naval Command, in cases of need, persons serving or having served as members of the Royal Navy, Royal Marines, Nursing, Womens Services, Reserves or Auxilliary services or being dependent spouse, widow or widower and to Promote the efficiency of the Royal Navy and Royal Marines by providing recreational facilities and amenities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 January 1967: Standard registration
- PLYMOUTH NAVAL COMMAND (Previous name)
- THE FLAG OFFICER PLYMOUTH FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain Iain RITCHIE RN | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Michael John Tanner | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.22k | £9.38k | £9.57k | £9.85k | £11.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.73k | £6.18k | £2.69k | £15.58k | £13.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17TH OCTOBER 1966 AND SCHEME OF 20TH JUNE 1972, AS AMENDED BY S 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT ON 26TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
(I) ASSISTING IN THE AREA OF THE PLYMOUTH NAVAL COMMAND IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED AS OFFICERS, WOS POS, NCOS, RATINGS OTHER RANKS OR MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL NAVY OR THE ROYAL MARINES OR NURSING OR WOMEN'S SERVICES OR ANY RESERVES OR AUXILIARY SERVICES OFFICIALLY ASSOCIATED THEREWITH OR BEING DEPENDANTS, WIVES, WIDOWS OR ISSUE OF THE PERSONS AFORESAID. (II) PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES IN THE AREA OF THE PLYMOUTH COMMAND. (III) MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES THAT BENEFIT THE ABOVE PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL FLEET CLUB CHARITY
CAF OFFICE
FENNER BLOCK
HMS DRAKE
PLYMOUTH
PL2 2BG
- Phone:
- 01752555277
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window