Financial history NEATH HOSPITALS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 250292
Charity reporting is overdue by 1531 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £22.32k £70.47k £22.39k £19.16k £26.75k
Total expenditure £32.76k £41.23k £61.04k £8.38k £20.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A