Financial history THE ORIENTAL CERAMIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 250356
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £45.22k £45.51k £51.59k £71.91k £80.27k
Total expenditure £40.67k £33.55k £41.20k £61.55k £46.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A