INSTITUTE OF CAST METALS ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Technical support and information; use of library; registration with Engineering Council for Internationally recognised professional grades.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 January 1967: Standard registration
- ICME (Working name)
- INSTITUTE OF BRITISH FOUNDRYMEN (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Evans FICME | Chair | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cairns Prof MICME | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Bennett | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Laing | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Pritchard FICME | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arron Rimmer | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Dudley FICME | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toni Carannante | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Alexander FICME | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Ayre FICME | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Stevenson FICME | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.15k | £84.81k | £82.84k | £177.30k | £311.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.88k | £223.13k | £205.24k | £274.52k | £297.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.09k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 1921 AS AMENDED 11 OCTOBER 2000 AND 1 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE INTELLECTUAL WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS BY PERIODICAL MEETINGS FOR READING AND DISCUSSING SCIENTIFIC PAPERS ON SUBJECTS CONNECTED WITH THE FOUNDRY AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES, AND SUCH OTHER MATTERS AS MAY BE CONSIDERED WITHIN THE SCOPE OF THE SPECIAL AUTHORITY. TO INITIATE, CONDUCT AND SUPERVISE RESEARCHES INTO THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF THE ART OF METAL AND ALLOY PRODUCTION, CASTING AND WORKING. TO ORGANISE AND CONDUCT OR ADVISE ON MEANS AND SYSTEMS OF EDUCATION FOR ALL OR ANY GRADES OF OPERATIVES OR WORKERS IN THE ART AND CRAFT OF METAL CASTING AND TO COLLECT AND DISTRIBUTE INFORMATION ON THE SCIENCE AND ART OF FOUNDING AND ALLIED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 03 January 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL FOUNDRY TRAINING CENTRE
ECMS
TIPTON ROAD
TIPTON
WEST MIDLANDS
DY4 7UW
- Phone:
- 01217521810
- Email:
- info@icme.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window