THE PALMER BROTHERS TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 30 November 1966: Standard registration
- 08 July 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £672 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 11 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 26TH SEPTEMBER 1966 AND SCHEME OF 2ND JULY 1974.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE TERM "THE AGED" MEANING ANY PERSON WHO IS OF AN AGE WHEREBY HE OR SHE IS OR WOULD BE AT THE TIME ENTITLED TO A STATE OLD AGE PENSION. COLCHESTER AS CONSTITUTED IMMEDIATELY BEFORE 1ST APRIL 1974.
Area of benefit
DISTRICTS OF COLCHESTER AND TENDRING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window