CHURCH OF CHRIST, BURSLEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship God, outreach, training, Bible study
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 20 April 1967: Standard registration
- CHURCH OF CHRIST (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEC ELLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Martin Robinson | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Hirpo Kumbi | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Michael Seadon | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR TIM ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHLEY MARIA ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £3.00k | £4.05k | £5.29k | £7.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.61k | £3.60k | £3.34k | £5.76k | £7.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST AND CONVEYANCE DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1961.
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AND OCCUPIED AS A MANSE OR PLACE OF RESIDENCE FOR THE MINISTER FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE CHURCH OF CHRIST BURSLEM OF THE ASSOCIATION OF CHURCHES OF CHRIST IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND.
Area of benefit
BURSLEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Of Christ
Macclesfield Street
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 1HU
- Phone:
- 01782541798
- Email:
- church.burslem@virgin.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window