Dersingham Parochial Church Council

Charity number: 250450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Church of St Nicholas, Dersingham is part of The Church of England whose mission is:- To proclaim the good news of the kingdom. To teach, baptise and nurture new believers. To respond to human need by loving service. To seek to transform unjust structures of society. To strive to safeguard the integrity of creation and sustain the life of the earth.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £162,725
Total expenditure: £141,757

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 September 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DERSINGHAM PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
  • FUNDS HELD IN CONNEXION WITH ST NICHOLAS' CHURCH, DERSINGHAM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MARK ANDREW CAPRON Chair 25 April 2016
DERSINGHAM UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY FOR A SCHOOL
Received: On time
Hilda Anne Hynde Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jill Kirbyshire Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Ronald Gordon Cossou Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Susan Asbridge Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Emma Dinmore Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Margaret Anderson Mrs Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Jane Dorothy Churchill Trustee 27 April 2020
None on record
Clive Edward Browne Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
PATRICIA OUGHTIBRIDGE Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
KATRINA MUNDY Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
THOMAS WHEELER Trustee 07 April 2013
None on record
NEIL JOHN ADAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £134.49k £109.71k £125.73k £136.03k £162.73k
Total expenditure £137.95k £112.91k £108.49k £100.76k £141.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.75k £5.00k £40.70k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 22 OCTOBER 1959
Charitable objects
FOR ANY PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH THE DERSINGHAM CHURCH WHICH THE VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS CONSIDER PROPER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 September 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
25B Station Road
Dersingham
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE31 6PR
Phone:
01485543951