Accounts and annual returns SUTTON IN ASHFIELD WELCOME INSTITUTE

Charity number: 250455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 November 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 July 2021 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required