Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS GLANGWILI HOSPITAL

Charity number: 250482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.95k £21.59k £83.63k £29.38k £57.59k
Total expenditure £38.06k £45.10k £2.18k £43.75k £12.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A