YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION BRIGHTLINGSEA BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Community space for local groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 08 December 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan William Dingwall | Chair | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lambert | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|||||
MARION RAWLINGS | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FRANCIS | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HOUSE | Trustee | 29 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP A CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.61k | £33.22k | £18.93k | £23.58k | £33.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.88k | £10.25k | £12.05k | £16.54k | £14.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION Y.M.C.A. AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO LEAD YOUNG MEN AND BOYS TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG MEN AND BOYS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE. (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES. (D) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (E) TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.EFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT,
Area of benefit
BRIGHLINGSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CHURCHILL CLOSE
BRIGHTLINGSEA
COLCHESTER
CO7 0RS
- Phone:
- 01206302253
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window